Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UNIVERSITY CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity Number: 1130491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVD DR WILLIAM ROBERT STUART LAMB Chair 02 May 2017
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Charles Thompson Trustee 04 May 2025
FESTIVAL SPIRIT
Received: On time
OXFORD WINTER NIGHT SHELTER
Received: On time
PAUL LINDSAY MASON Trustee 04 May 2025
None on record
Mx Aym Phoenix Maidment Trustee 04 May 2025
None on record
Dr John William Olson Trustee 04 May 2025
None on record
Dr Gemma Louise Wilson Trustee 04 May 2025
None on record
Rev Sorrel Shamel-Wood Trustee 22 April 2025
CUMNOR PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Received: On time
Eleanor Pritchard Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Roger Nascimento Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Louise Jarvis Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Adam Hardiman Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Michael Charles Stevens Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Alison Le Cornu Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Rev Naomi Gardom Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Professor Sarah Mortimer Trustee 30 May 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII
Received: On time
Rev Alan Ramsey Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Karen Melham Trustee 02 May 2022
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Hannah Cartwright Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
megan Roper Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Tessa Charlotte Blenkinsop Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
Nicholas Hardyman Trustee 22 April 2018
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
Felix Leach Trustee 15 May 2014
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
ELEANOR POLLY WILLIAMS Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record