Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ACTON

Charity Number: 1130252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jose Augusto dos Santos Fernandes Chair 13 June 2023
ACTON (MIDDLESEX) EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ACTON (MIDDLESEX) RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
MOZAMBIQUE AND ANGOLA ANGLICAN ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Elisabeth Santos Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Albert Routledge Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Peter Richard Allen Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
REV Dean Matthew Ayres Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
YVONNE KISIEDU Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Lara Sandra Louise Hill Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record