CYMDEITHAS CERDD DANT CYMRU

Charity number: 500350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of Cerdd Dant

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £96,050
Total expenditure: £91,081

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CYMDEITHAS CERDD DANT CYMRU (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OWAIN SION WILLIAMS Chair
None on record
Lois Eifion Jones Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Lleucu Arfon Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Catrin Alwen Jones Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Marged Kim Lloyd Jones Trustee 30 December 2021
None on record
Gavin Rhys Ashcroft Trustee 30 December 2021
None on record
Helen Medi Williams Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
MENNA THOMAS Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
DYLAN CERNYW Trustee 12 September 2015
NANSI RICHARDS TRUST - YMDDIRIEDOLAETH NANSI RICHARDS
Received: On time
Llio Penri Trustee 01 January 2015
NANSI RICHARDS TRUST - YMDDIRIEDOLAETH NANSI RICHARDS
Received: On time
Delyth Medi Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
ELIN ANGHARAD DAVIES Trustee 25 September 2012
None on record
ELERI ROBERTS Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
ALWENA ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
NIA CLWYD Trustee
None on record
TREFOR PUGH Trustee
None on record
IWAN MORGAN Trustee
OPRA CYMRU CYF
Received: On time
Gwenan Mair Gibbard Trustee
NANSI RICHARDS TRUST - YMDDIRIEDOLAETH NANSI RICHARDS
Received: On time
MENAI WILLIAMS Trustee
EISTEDDFOD GADEIRIOL DYFFRYN OGWEN
Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days
EINIR WYN JONES Trustee
None on record
ARFON WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.55k £123.50k £43.04k £35.48k £96.05k
Total expenditure £86.01k £45.49k £49.53k £83.37k £91.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 January 2025 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 January 2025 351 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL AND CODICIL DATED 18 OCTOBER 1958
Charitable objects
FOR THE CYMDEITHAS CERDD DANT TO ESTABLISH A CLASS OR SCHOOL IN PORTHCAWL FOR THE PURPOSE OF TEACHING PUPILS TO PLAY THE HARP AND SING TO THE HARP IN THE TRADITIONAL WELSH MANNER. ONE HALF OF THE BEQUEST FOR THE PURCHASE OF HARPS TO BE ALLOCATED TO THE COUNTIES OF SOUTH WALES, TO BE LENT OUT TO THOSE ANXIOUS TO LEARN HARP PLAYING, NOT TO BE RESTRICTED TO THE 18 YEARS OF AGE LIMIT AS IN NORTH WALES. THE OTHER HALF OF THE BEQUEST FOR USE IN HOLDING OF CLASSES AND THE GIVING OF LESSONS IN HARP PLAYING AND SINGING TO THE HARP IN SOUTH WALES.
Area of benefit
WALES
Registration history
  • 29 October 1970 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
TYDDYN ARTHUR
TAI ARTHUR
PENISARWAUN
CAERNARFON
GWYNEDD
LL55 3PN
Phone:
01286 872488