THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTHAW & CUFFLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are available to all people in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Northaw & Cuffley to promote the whole Mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,993 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC 0F NORTHAW & CUFFLEY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Richard Hargrave Kilgour | Chair | 30 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Ian Jackson | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Jayne Stringer | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Marion Bagguley | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Grant Hall | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Virginia Ann Robinson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Namutebi Semakula | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Lesley Keys | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Dora Jean Hall | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kathy Shingles | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Doreen Sheekey | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mr Chris Shingles | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.09k | £81.37k | £102.67k | £94.87k | £202.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.67k | £107.31k | £117.30k | £121.59k | £181.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £282 | N/A | £1.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANDREWS CHURCH
PLOUGH HILL
CUFFLEY
POTTERS BAR
EN6 4DR
- Phone:
- 07446 516945
- Email:
- office@norcuff.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window