ST MICHAELS WITHOUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican Church in Bath city centre. Providing spiritual and social care to our local community and visitors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 24 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- THE PCC OF ST. MICHAEL'S WITH ST. PAUL, BATH (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL WITH ST. PAUL, BATH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Roger John Driver | Chair | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD HOLDEN | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
David Snook | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Holden | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jon Winchcombe | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Claire Snell | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alistair James Haggerty | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Valentine Betts | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pleace | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Charles Dods | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Walker | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOSEPH EGAN | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TAPSFIELD | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JANE WATTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.08k | £226.35k | £272.13k | £314.78k | £334.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.48k | £234.57k | £269.85k | £323.13k | £321.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.58k | £8.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED 27/07/2014
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michael Without
Broad Street
BATH
BA1 5LP
- Phone:
- 01225447103
- Email:
- office@stmichaelsbath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window