Financial history POYNTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £220.01k £85.49k £104.90k £108.31k £124.04k
Total expenditure £217.67k £102.85k £105.77k £109.77k £103.38k
Income from government contracts £66.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.75k £3.70k N/A N/A N/A