THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BEVERLEY

Charity number: 1131295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S,BEVERLEY,PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV REBECCA ALISON LUMLEY Chair 21 April 2012
TWO CHURCHES ONE TOWN
Received: On time
Ian kenneth Jackson Trustee 30 April 2023
THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH , BEVERLEY
Received: On time
Lesley Jane Jackson Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Anne Crossley Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Simon Pike Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Richard Mattock Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
John Edmond Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Allan Ball Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Alice Lee Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Jill Francis Edmond Trustee 21 May 2021
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEVERLEY ST MARY CHURCH ESTATE
Received: 21 days late
THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH , BEVERLEY
Received: On time
Keith Gilson Trustee 21 May 2021
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEVERLEY ST MARY CHURCH ESTATE
Received: 21 days late
TWO CHURCHES ONE TOWN
Received: On time
Joanne Louise BOULTER Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
GILLIAN BRENDA GREGORY Trustee 24 April 2016
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEVERLEY ST MARY CHURCH ESTATE
Received: 21 days late
ANNE MANSFIELD Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
STEPHEN DAVID PARKIN Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
BEVERLEY LAWRENCE Trustee
THE BEVERLEY COMPANY OF CHURCH LADS AND CHURCH GIRLS BRIGADE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £529.14k £787.90k £829.06k £327.16k £773.15k
Total expenditure £383.31k £931.24k £912.07k £334.01k £305.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £431.32k £700.55k £735.98k N/A £654.84k
Income - Other trading activities £33.64k £10.99k £21.06k N/A £53.73k
Income - Charitable activities £13.27k £6.89k £7.24k N/A £11.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £50.92k £52.14k £46.50k N/A £53.02k
Income - Other £0 £17.34k £18.28k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £0 N/A £484.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £377.91k £926.96k £910.04k N/A £286.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.40k £4.28k £2.03k N/A £18.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A £1.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Long-term investments £1.89m £1.77m £2.03m N/A £2.39m
Other assets £357.00k £439.89k £349.89k N/A £432.19k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £15.52k £16.75k £12.96k N/A £34.06k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST MARY'S PARISH OFFICE
St. Marys Church
North Bar Within
BEVERLEY
HU17 8DL
Phone:
01482869137
Website:

stmarysbeverley.org