THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF JESMOND

Charity number: 1134530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PCC continued to work in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the Church, Church hall and Church grounds of Jesmond Parish Church together with the vicarage and curate's house.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £249,435
Total expenditure: £251,489

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE P.C.C. OF JESMOND PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Right Reverend Jonathan Justin Speaight Pryke Chair
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Anglican International Development Ltd
Received: On time
Dr Oliver David Turner Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Yanjun Chen Bromley Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Dr Kathryn Rowan Bell Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Jonathan Peter Wake Green Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Andrew David Shaw Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Hilary Louise Caisley Trustee 14 May 2023
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Richard Whitehall Trustee 14 May 2023
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Joyce Addison Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Jonathan David McAllister Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Peter Slegg Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Heather Jackson Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Dr William Sackville Tufton Trustee 17 March 2014
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Dr SUSAN MARY LEE Trustee 30 September 2011
None on record
REV IAN TIMOTHY SIMON GARRETT Trustee 30 September 2011
None on record
LAURA MARGUERITE EDITH ROBB Trustee
None on record
GLYNIS MARGARET MACKIE Trustee
None on record
DONNA RUTH LAWRENCE Trustee
None on record
MR ANDREW COULSON Trustee
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Rev RAMZI PAUL ADCOCK Trustee
THE HOLY TRINITY GATESHEAD CHURCH TRUST
Received: 73 days late
Friends of Ravenswood
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN OUTREACH MISSION EDUCATION (COME)
Received: 39 days late
JANICE ANNE JOLLEY Trustee
None on record
MR ANDY MATHERS Trustee
None on record
REVEREND DAVID RONALD JAMES HOLLOWAY Trustee
THE NORTHERN COUNTIES CHILDREN'S BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE JESMOND TRUST
Received: On time
Anglican International Development Ltd
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN INSTITUTE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £180.12k £163.00k £173.95k £239.39k £249.44k
Total expenditure £179.99k £166.35k £173.57k £238.75k £251.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Jesmond Parish Church
Eskdale Terrace
Jesmond
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE2 4DJ
Phone:
01912127400