Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS

Charity number: 1130802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Craig Benjamin Myers Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Claire Tillotson Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Ann Shirley Dalton Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Sue Slaney Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Catherine Bingham Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Gloria Sherman Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Janet Boam Trustee 19 March 2017
None on record
ROBIN HOGG Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
KEITH MILLS Trustee 27 April 2014
MARY MACARTHUR HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
ANN-MARIE JEFFERYS Trustee 29 April 2009
FRANCON TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Dawson Trustee 01 May 2000
None on record
PATRICIA CHASE Trustee
None on record