Trustees ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

44 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN JAMES BAMBER MA MTH BSC Chair 01 September 2016
None on record
Adrian Besant B.Ed BA Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Michelle Marshall Trustee 16 October 2024
WYTON SCHOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ERIKA JAYNE MONICA PRICE BA Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
ANITA ALICE PELLATT MA Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Joanne Mary Anderton Trustee 23 July 2023
CHURCHES' LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE (CLAS)
Received: On time
WEST MICHAEL THOMAS Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Deborah Venice Elizabeth Cannon Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
Dr DAVID WARD PhD Cambs Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Carol Ann Simpson AAT Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Dr Timothy Simon Kelby BA MSc PhD Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Christopher John Thompson Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Rev Susan Joan Baker MA Trustee 20 August 2020
None on record
John Wrycroft FRICS Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Rev Nicholas Witham BA Hons Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
John Michael Green Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Leonore Marigold Charlton Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Helen Mary Tydda B ED Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Denise Janet Whatley Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
Martin Baker Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record