THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, MILTON-NEXT-GRAVESEND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH, MILTON PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDREW DAVEY | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER WINTER | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN OSBORNE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Parsonson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KIRBY | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Read | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DONOVAN | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN REILLY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Shoesmith | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MARIE HORNBY | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MAUREEN OSBORNE | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ELIZABETH BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV JACQUELINE PATRICIA LITTLEWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA ANN READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA RUTH KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW NAILOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOSEPH HUMPHRIES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.49k | £146.81k | £172.09k | £186.07k | £364.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.94k | £160.47k | £170.32k | £172.42k | £297.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Old Road East
Gravesend
DA12 1NR
- Phone:
- 01474 352643
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window