Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LINDFIELD
Charity number: 1131687

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KATHRYN MARGARET RUBY SPENSLEY | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Prescott | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Simon Porter | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Bence | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Donougher | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Esther Morris | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jennifer Hateley | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Rose Leonard | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Mark Rowland Lucas | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Anna Mary Tostevin Leiwe | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Norris | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Robert Chamberlain Nichols | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Patrick William Scoble | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER JAMES PARMENTER TAYLOR | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Timothy Griffiths | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Paul Alexander England | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEVIN HARGIN | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Hugh Edward Bourne | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE NICHOLLS | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAVAN WOOD | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.