Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, HAROLD WOOD

Charity Number: 1131911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Olanike Adenuga Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
Dr Mobolaji Olawumi Orisatoki Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
Martyn Blackman Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Meyrick Owsley Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Rachel Grimwood Trustee 20 April 2023
HAROLD WOOD FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Julian Hardy Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Adejoke Adenike Haastrup-Onilgbo Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
JESSICA GAIL POTTINGER Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Rev Andrew David Bellis Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
John Stuart Baker Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
John Harris Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Dr Arikoge Joseph Ogedegbe Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Charity Okoli Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
John Yew Chai Chan Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
Rob Hudson Trustee 29 April 2014
GOOD STEWARDS TRUST - ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: On time
LIZ BOWDEN Trustee 04 July 2012
None on record
PETER THOMPSON Trustee 04 July 2012
None on record
JOHN VICTOR DAVIS Trustee
None on record
CHRIS KNOWLES Trustee
None on record
IAN MICHAEL DAVID JEFFERY Trustee
None on record
MATTHEW EDWARD ELLIS HARRISON Trustee
None on record