THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, HERTFORD

Charity number: 1132540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of youth and children's clubs with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £197,984
Total expenditure: £181,483

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HERTFORD ST ANDREW PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV ALAN STEWART Chair
NEWTON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF HERTINGFORDBURY ST MARY
Received: On time
Lesley Self Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Julie Markey Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
JUDY SHARMAN Trustee 11 September 2023
HERTFORD ST ANDREW COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Collinson Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Jenny Mant Trustee 30 April 2023
THE WILD TROUT TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Julie Frazer Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Christine Barclay Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Adrian Walter Trustee 26 March 2022
None on record
MARIA HENRIKSSON-BELL Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Catherine Sleath Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
LAURA FRANCES RAMSAY Trustee 19 June 2012
HERTFORD ST ANDREW COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
MALCOLM GABRIEL LOCK FRY Trustee 01 May 2011
HERTFORD ST ANDREW COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Rev WILLIAM JOHN CHURCH Trustee
ANCIENT CHARITIES OF HERTFORD
Received: On time
MR CHRIS SEWARD Trustee
THE HERTFORD MUSEUM CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £180.08k £153.01k £173.41k £190.31k £197.98k
Total expenditure £171.84k £154.13k £158.25k £177.71k £181.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Andrew's Church
St. Andrew Street
HERTFORD
SG14 1HZ
Phone:
01992 504373