BASINGSTOKE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship services each Sunday, together with activities for children. Tuesday morning distribution of free food to anyone in need. Tuesday community cafe at lunchtime, open to all. Wednesday morning food distribution in partnership with Basingstoke Foodbank (by referral only). Outreach work with local community, schools and chaplaincy to the local hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Bishop | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Sally-Anne Spooner | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Israel Ogbole | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Meeghan Ronwen Kumse | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kok-Yee Wong | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nana Kwabena Amoafo | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bishop | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Knight | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Moar | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Julia Hill | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dilley | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.08k | £141.41k | £111.99k | £112.66k | £112.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.89k | £182.66k | £104.14k | £106.29k | £130.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basingstoke Baptist Church
Gershwin Road
BASINGSTOKE
RG22 4HL
- Phone:
- 01256 324297
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window