LEEDS NORTH AND EAST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The provision of Sacred space (a building) for prayer and contemplation. 2. Supporting other charities in the UK and Overseas financially and with prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£527,870
Donations and legacies | £30.66k | |
Charitable activities | £437.13k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £60.07k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£640,104
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £640.10k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £640.10k |
People

13 Employee(s)
69 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 17 July 2014: Funds received from 1134046 LEEDS NORTH EAST METHODIST CIRCUIT
- LEEDS EAST METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
69 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Laycock | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Yvonne Mary Thornton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Saunders | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Anthony Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Liesl Warren | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Ekeno Koriang | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Francis | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Stanley Barwis Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Karen Anne Illingworth | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Marion Bright | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie Elizabeth Faint | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Steven Granville Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Garlick | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Saddler | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Irene Mullins | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Abbott | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Hoto | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JENNIFER DIANE DALTON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennie Reeve | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Howard James Clinkard | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Lambert | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jackie Claxton Ruddock | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Rebecca Stennett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Mary Curl | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Joyce Griffith | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifeer Margaret Kyle | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David John Preston | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shirley Moran | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Anthony Prince | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Tanya Marie Short | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Anne Elizabeth Sudworth Vautrey | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Christine Stopford | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David Bolton Cundall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Peter David Howdle | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Susan Noble | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Edward Sakwe | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Janice Green | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Tessa Francis | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Mark Colin Stennett | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Helen White | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT KILCOYNE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN WITT DipEd | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH MARGARET MALIA | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Richard Mark Vautrey | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
CAROL JENSEN | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
EMELIA PETERSON | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
BIRKETT,ANDREW JOHN BA | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ANN BURT | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN PRIOR | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE KIRKLAND | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE FRIEZE BA | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA BRITTON | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN WITTRICK BSc, FCMA | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
BARBARA ELAINE BELSHAM BA MSc | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Rev George Peter Bailey | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET AVEYARD | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DOROTHY TURNPENNY | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RAMONA ACTIVE AAT | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ALISON LESLEY ROBERTS | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DENISE CARISS | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GRENVILLE ARTHUR JENSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KATHRYN GLASBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JEAN HOPKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LESLEY BRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR CHRISTINE RUTH HOLDSTOCK BSc, PhD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN CROLL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596.78k | £556.72k | £882.15k | £498.03k | £527.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £572.56k | £598.23k | £886.91k | £657.91k | £640.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £53.70k | £60.14k | £31.49k | N/A | £30.66k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £12.13k | £10.33k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £480.30k | £447.02k | N/A | £437.13k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.84k | £4.16k | £4.76k | N/A | £60.07k | |
|
Income - Other | £539.24k | £0 | £388.55k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | £598.23k | £886.91k | N/A | £640.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £3.60k | £3.60k | N/A | £4.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £19.65k | £23.28k | N/A | £12.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £572.56k | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.58m | £3.84m | £3.56m | N/A | £4.67m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £738.84k | £684.40k | £1.08m | N/A | £799.76k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £140.84k | £127.91k | £118.27k | N/A | £105.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 January 2025 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 January 2025 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 320 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2022 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIDGETT PARK METHODIST CHURCH
LIDGETT PLACE
LEEDS
LS8 1HG
- Phone:
- 01132663309
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window