Financial history CENTRE FOR ACCESS TO FOOTBALL IN EUROPE (CAFE)

Charity number: 1131339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £493.82k £811.53k £531.78k £550.70k £455.61k
Total expenditure £690.82k £623.87k £722.72k £771.17k £440.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £748.93k £523.80k £550.70k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £62.61k £7.97k £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £623.87k £722.72k £771.17k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £3.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A