Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL COUNCIL OF ALL SAINTS, SOUTH CAVE

Charity number: 1131863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £82.32k £84.22k £85.85k £130.26k £122.82k
Total expenditure £74.86k £75.11k £93.76k £101.87k £168.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £800
Income from government grants £2.64k £2.56k N/A N/A N/A