Financial history WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1133739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.72m £2.74m £2.35m £2.95m £2.72m
Total expenditure £3.35m £4.50m £4.39m £3.81m £3.47m
Income from government contracts £939.82k £958.00k £1.29m £1.30m £1.59m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £50.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £70.00k £38.00k £4.00k £86.00k £70.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.27m £2.30m £1.88m £2.41m £2.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £372.00k £397.00k £323.00k £456.00k £308.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £148.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £63.00k £34.00k £2.00k £84.00k £69.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.93m £4.11m £4.18m £3.37m £3.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £251.00k £266.00k £218.00k £214.00k £112.00k
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £11.00k £74.00k £53.00k £85.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £22.00k £19.00k £22.00k £11.00k £7.00k
Expenditure - Other £174.00k £120.00k £0 £220.00k £0