Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HERSHAM

Charity number: 1131361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £373.32k £415.16k £259.18k £176.75k £283.29k
Total expenditure £278.25k £338.73k £265.53k £245.16k £330.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.75k
Income from government grants £10.50k £17.60k N/A N/A £6.75k