THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TRING TEAM

Charity number: 1132255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £393,562
Total expenditure: £394,163

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Susan Stratford Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Maria Denise Lashley Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Beryl Eileen Poll Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Stephenson Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Phillippa Wright Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Celestria Bell Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Gill Kinsey Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Jane Rachel Brown Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Rev Michelle Elizabeth Grace Trustee 05 July 2017
ALDBURY GRAVES TRUST
Received: On time
CATHERINE MARY WILLIAMS CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
Reverend Canon Jane Catherine Banister Trustee 18 November 2015
THE TRING CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Received: On time
Ian Munro Trustee 12 October 2011
None on record
Vivianne Child Trustee
None on record
JANET ELIZABETH GOODYER Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL CHARLES WATKIN Trustee
None on record
Rev HUW BELLIS Trustee
ALDBURY GRAVES TRUST
Received: On time
CATHERINE MARY WILLIAMS CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
PUTTENHAM PARISH ROOM (OTHERWISE THE PUTTENHAM MISSION HALL)
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PARISH CHURCH, PUTTENHAM, HERTS
Received: On time
THE RIDGEWAY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST CROSS CHURCH, WILSTONE, HERTFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
CHRISTINE RUTTER Trustee
PUTTENHAM PARISH ROOM (OTHERWISE THE PUTTENHAM MISSION HALL)
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PARISH CHURCH, PUTTENHAM, HERTS
Received: On time
THE PUTTENHAM TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
EDWARD THOMPSON ORAM Trustee
TRING CHARITIES MILLENNIUM EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRING CHARITIES
Received: On time
Timothy Roland James Trustee
None on record
Jonathan Owen Reynolds Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £292.30k £246.83k £260.13k £291.42k £393.56k
Total expenditure £309.59k £269.03k £270.02k £305.62k £394.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 The Limes
Station Road
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 5NW
Phone:
07885143763
Website:

tringteamparish.org.uk