Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ST PAUL, ALNWICK

Charity number: 1131297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £191.13k £325.10k £157.21k £231.73k £714.65k
Total expenditure £152.85k £374.18k £149.29k £146.96k £150.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £656.11k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £30.84k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.06k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £239
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £560.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £130.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.07k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £917