Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY ABBOTS, KENSINGTON

Charity Number: 1132235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £440.19k £517.93k £644.92k £680.51k £954.26k
Total expenditure £525.15k £504.12k £659.51k £839.09k £815.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.47k £9.75k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £192.37k £285.75k £261.68k £361.44k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £206.97k £257.31k £257.75k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £21.18k £119.26k £121.81k £125.79k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £304.38k £41.02k £39.71k £34.18k
Income - Other N/A £0 £2.53k £0 £175.11k
Income - Legacies N/A £10.73k £12.52k £10.71k £20.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £447.46k £639.24k £825.45k £780.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £18.40k £20.27k £13.65k £34.94k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £61.29k £60.13k £20.39k £74.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £6.61k £7.67k £3.94k £8.15k
Expenditure - Other N/A £38.26k £0 £0 £0