Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORSHAM DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1132246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £747.61k £610.15k £720.11k £733.21k £695.55k
Total expenditure £576.18k £514.52k £589.29k £769.37k £742.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.80k £21.32k £10.49k £30.66k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £544.08k £365.47k £414.27k £416.60k £331.48k
Income - Other trading activities £70.25k £95.21k £130.92k £133.15k £143.22k
Income - Charitable activities £129.30k £146.87k £167.26k £160.68k £198.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £36.98k £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.03k £1.61k £6.55k £22.60k £22.38k
Income - Other £1.95k £978 £1.10k £180 £4
Income - Legacies £187.39k £15.35k £50.50k £5.00k £5.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £550.63k £474.96k £546.94k £714.41k £623.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.25k £3.88k £5.98k £3.86k £2.05k
Expenditure - Governance £23.54k £28.04k £5.58k £5.30k £5.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.60k £9.47k £5.06k £6.07k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £23.30k £35.69k £36.37k £51.10k £116.22k