Radiotherapy UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Advocating to improve access to high quality radiotherapy treatment across the UK. - Developing patient information packages - Supporting skills and knowledge development of radiotherapy workforce
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
- ACADEMIC CLINICAL ONCOLOGY AND RADIOBIOLOGY RESEARCH NETWORK (Working name)
- ACTION RADIOTHERAPY (Working name)
- ACORRN - ACTION RADIOTHERAPY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF PATRICIA PRICE | Chair |
|
||||||
Adele Lyons | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andy Tudor | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA CHAPMAN | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Louise Hague | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Beavis | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samina Hussain | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Christy Goldsmith | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TANYA PERSEY | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr PHILIP MAYLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/06/2020 | 22/06/2021 | 22/06/2022 | 22/06/2023 | 22/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.36k | £111.19k | £173.74k | £128.57k | £117.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.59k | £43.11k | £92.34k | £112.91k | £162.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 June 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 22 June 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 APRIL 2010 as amended on 28 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO RADIOTHERAPY, RADIOBIOLOGY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BY SUCH ACTIONS AS: (A) PROMOTING AND FACILITATING MULTIDISCIPLINARY COLLABORATION BETWEEN RESEARCHERS AND PRACTITIONERS IN RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS; (B) INFORMING PATIENTS AND THE PUBLIC ABOUT PRACTICE AND RESEARCH IN RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS, AND ENGAGING PATIENTS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH PROJECTS; (C) AWARDING GRANTS AS APPROPRIATE. (2) TO ADVANCE AND BENEFIT THE PRACTICE OF RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY SUCH ACTIONS AS: (A) PROMOTING AND FACILITATING MULTIDISCIPLINARY NETWORKING AND SHARING OF EXPERTISE AND BEST PRACTICE; (B) PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS; (C) PROMOTING AND FACILITATING INCREASED INVOLVEMENT OF ALLIED PROFESSIONS; (D) FACILITATING DEVELOPMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF BEST PRACTICES IN RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS; (E) DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING ALL ASPECTS OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS; (F) PROMOTING AND FACILITATING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE RESEARCH AND PRACTICE OF RADIOTHERAPY AND ITS ALLIED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Abbotsbury House
139 Abbotsbury Road
LONDON
W14 8EN
- Phone:
- 02030515671
- Email:
- info@radiotherapy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window