ROMFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Romford Methodist Circuit is the primary unit to which the 10 local churches are connected for the purposes of mission.It is the Circuit to which ministers are stationed and preachers trained and it is responsible for the effective deployment of the resources of ministry - people, property and finance, providing sacred space and space for community activities in sympathy with our Christian ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

42 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Havering
- Thurrock
Governance
- 19 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Eleanor Gillian Jackson | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Janice Elsie Mann | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Jongikaya Zihle | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Robert Johnson Maginley | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Rachel Read | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Patricia Nakabukye | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Melani Semuel-Good | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Peter Geoffrey Hobbs | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Anne Barbara Ling | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
William Donaldson Andrews | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Timothy Howard Banks | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Bruce Frederick Langridge | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Gillian Joyce Hills | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Rohama Asif | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Thomas Mercer | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Jonathan Sisman | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Sarah Jane Rigby | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Stephen Owusu | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Peter Caton | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Evelyn Song | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rosemary Helen Hibbard | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Lady Asafu-Adjaye | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Hilary Bull | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Mary Acquah | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
James Coleman | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Jacqueline Alison Howard | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Regina Abigail Coleman | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Thomas Edward James Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Susan Elizabeth Stevens | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Cicely Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
JAYNE ROSEMARY MATTHEWS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Manasa Jerera | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Cathy Simmons | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
JOAN WINIFRED PUGSLEY | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Janice Susan Gowlett | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
PAMELA ANN COLES | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
DENISE SWANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
TREVOR BERTRAM PUGSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
Dr NIGEL FRANCIS MASTERS BSC ARCS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
TURPLIN DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
MALCOLM NEIL RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
PENELOPE ANNE MASTERS SRN, RM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328.38k | £338.06k | £308.95k | £1.66m | £325.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.33k | £315.07k | £317.98k | £1.07m | £437.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £239.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.37m | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £672.64k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Clockhouse Lane
ROMFORD
RM5 3QP
- Phone:
- 01708960549
- Email:
- ROMFORDCIRCUIT.adm@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window