Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S, PARKSTONE
Charity Number: 1134767

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart John Cocksedge | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Philip Cotterell | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael de Winton-Gilbert | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Trevor William Muddimer | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Compton Browning | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin George Counsell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Alison Lloyds | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Louise Sturgess | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Cullis | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Murphy | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justin George Blakeney Anson Coldstream | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Roberts | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Amy Giles | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Holst | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steve Blight | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL PATTISON | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Roger Michael Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.