Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTON HOLY TRINITY, AYLESBURY

Charity number: 1133103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guy Willimont Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Andrew McCarthy Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Rev Andrew Paul Johnson Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Amanda Henderson Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Jocelyn Edward Chappell Trustee 29 May 2022
PUTNAM HOUSE FUND
Received: On time
Christopher Graham Dalladay Trustee 17 May 2021
AYLESBURY CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Shani Frances Bragg Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Nicola Joan Strachan Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Matthew Edward John Tomson Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Bruce Sinclair Cullen Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Penelope Jane Hurst Trustee 28 April 2019
WALTON HOLY TRINITY NATIONAL SCHOOL
Received: On time
MICHAEL ALAN EDWARD FULKER Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
Graham Strachan Trustee 01 May 2013
AYLESBURY DEANERY TRUST
Received: On time