Trustees East Mercia Methodist Circuit

Charity number: 1132523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

53 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nathan Stuart Falla Chair 01 September 2023
RUGBY METHODIST CHURCH CENTRE
Received: On time
Rev Brian Hutton Trustee 01 September 2024
DAVENTRY METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Ian Francis Basson Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
Stephen Hone Trustee 30 July 2024
THE WILLIAM AND PATRICIA VENTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Christine Greenaway Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Steven John Burt Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
David Graham Brierley Trustee 29 February 2024
DAVENTRY METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Ebenezeer Amo-Baiden Trustee 14 January 2024
None on record
Dr Ernest Peter Muir Trustee 17 January 2023
DAVENTRY METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Rev Trevor John Robert Thomas Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
MILDRED WENDY CURTIS Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Helen Ruth Cross Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Peter Alan Candlin Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev Alison Frances Tomlin BA, BD Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Fiona Susan Clarkson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev DAVID RAYMOND TOMLIN Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Angela Wooliscroft Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Ada-June Kusogbo Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
PAT BASSON Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Roger Edward Robert Piper Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record