Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL LOUGHBOROUGH

Charity number: 1132853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £358.33k £355.34k £373.60k £409.40k £396.20k
Total expenditure £366.18k £374.68k £424.73k £429.73k £426.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.39k N/A N/A N/A N/A