THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARTIN OF TOURS, RUISLIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities - worship and fellowship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. MARTIN'S, RUISLIP PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mervyn Hogg | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Brazier | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Nicholes | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Jane Reading | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Trott | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lambourne | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID HOLMES GOLBY | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN DARGUE | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Diane Louise Bell | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Bertram Chapman | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gareth White | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Sheila Morris | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Wild | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Hammond | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE TUGNAIT | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danny Nicolaas William Dartnaill | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elaine Coulthurst | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline May Alderton | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JACOB | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bitok | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ROBERTS | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.89k | £180.31k | £185.26k | £188.80k | £208.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.87k | £203.62k | £174.97k | £176.84k | £163.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2024 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2024 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2022 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2022 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Martins Church
Eastcote Road
RUISLIP
Middlesex
HA4 8DG
- Phone:
- 01923828055
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window