Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOCKPORT, ST GEORGE

Charity number: 1134170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £148.96k £155.76k £174.96k £529.23k £226.28k
Total expenditure £140.72k £161.96k £167.54k £168.20k £178.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.12k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £123.18k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £22.37k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £17.90k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.62k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £360.15k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £5.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £166.24k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.96k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A