Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CARRINGTON

Charity Number: 1132333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £62.61k £52.15k £80.62k £69.93k £54.77k
Total expenditure £62.24k £54.72k £72.58k £78.19k £70.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.61k £3.05k N/A N/A N/A