Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, CARRINGTON

Charity Number: 1132333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Reginald Willmott Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Jo Walchester Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Rebecca Amy Nightingale Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Dr Maria Kontogianni Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Dr Amanda Hodgson Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Shaun Philip Hooper Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev Tracey Frances Byrne Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Denis Tully Trustee 15 April 2018
FAMILY CARE
Charity is insolvent