YOUTH FOR CHRIST CALDERDALE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising Youth Outreach events. Co-ordinating and and publicising Christian Youth Group activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- YFC CALDERDALE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.31k | £6.19k | £9.50k | £2.49k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.12k | £7.32k | £8.87k | £3.91k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 07 October 2019 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects ("the objects") are as follows: (a) To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of young people in accordance with the statement of faith appearing in appendix 1 throughout the world and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) in [???] and its environs; (b) the advancement of the Christian faith mainly, but not exclusively by means of proclaiming Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature throughout the world and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) in [???] and its environs; (c) to demonstrate, promote and encourage Christian values, including Dignity, Empowerment and Partnership to all young people throughout [???] and its environs; (d) the advancement of the education of children and young people through support and mentoring in schools, colleges and other educational establishments. Through lunchtime and after school clubs, street based youth work and other youth provision to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities, that they may grow to full maturity as individuals, and that their condition of life may be improved; (e) to relieve poverty and sickness thereby demonstrating the Christian faith by promoting overseas service, education, practical action and working with those affected, either directly or through relevant relief agencies.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window