THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, HAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S HAMPTON PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ben Robert Lovell | Chair | 06 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Anthony-Paul Cooper | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Teri-Anne Duncombe Cavanagh | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ricarda Cornelia Maria Christa Baldock | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Abigail Briggs | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Jones | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew William Branwell Parish | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
David Western | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Watts | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
HILARY HART | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Fiona Rowett | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Ronald Lewis Pettit | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Cara Frances Lovell | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JONATHAN MARK WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Nalindra Fernando | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
NIGEL LEWIS FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MISS M J COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.75k | £283.11k | £265.85k | £274.74k | £247.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565.72k | £267.66k | £275.33k | £337.33k | £287.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.03k | N/A | £166 | £9.86k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY'S PARISH OFFICE
ST. MARY'S COMMUNITY HALL
CHURCH STREET
HAMPTON
MIDDLESEX
TW12 2EB
- Phone:
- 02089417221
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window