Financial history Ditchling Streat and Westmeston PCC

Charity Number: 1132488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £160.23k £153.59k £143.45k £142.34k £170.47k
Total expenditure £172.59k £174.43k £244.90k £200.82k £182.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.37k N/A £350 £350 £1.02k