Ditchling Streat and Westmeston PCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion in the Parishes of Ditchling, Streat and Westmeston of the Gospel of Our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. Within the ecclesiastical parish co-operating with the incumbent David Wallis the whole mission of the church pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. The churches and pastoral support are open to all regardless of belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- Ditchling Streat and Westmeston PCC (Working name)
- THE BEACON PARISH (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DITCHLING STREAT AND WESTMESTON (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID PETER WALLIS | Chair |
|
||||||
Lydia Charlotte Biersteker | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Stewart Henley | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Dawn Weltrowska | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Miarkowska | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke James Biersteker | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Evans | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Rosemarie Pauline De La Pole | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Clifford Sewell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sherrian Leigh Guest | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
TESSA MARIE HAUGHTON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Paul Edward Charman | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEITH RICHARD HINE | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|||||
SIR MARK MOODY-STUART | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET EILEEN BOVILL B.A. | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.28k | £160.23k | £153.59k | £143.45k | £142.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.84k | £172.59k | £174.43k | £244.90k | £200.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £766 | £8.37k | N/A | £350 | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 19 May 2021
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CHARLTON GARDENS
LEWES ROAD
DITCHLING
HASSOCKS
BN6 8WA
- Phone:
- 01273843165
- Email:
- admin@beaconparish.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window