THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTER, CHRIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH PCC, CHESTER (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anna Louise Leyden | Chair | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Achu Edison | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Calvin Hodgson | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hockley | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carys Addison | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Aragon-Escobosa | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Jones | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Ibrahim | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Hale | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ann Jones OBE | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Huntley Newman | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jay Cobb | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wigglesworth | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARGARET PINNELL THORP MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN CHIRGWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY MARGARET PETO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA JOHNSTON MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.99k | £116.22k | £114.77k | £94.90k | £113.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.43k | £122.91k | £107.72k | £109.05k | £119.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £220 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £670 | £241 | £1.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH MISSION HOUSE
31 CHURCH STREET
CHESTER
CH1 3JD
- Phone:
- 07443 584528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window