Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEWDLEY WITH RIBBESFORD & DOWLES

Charity Number: 1132968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £163.69k £163.34k £130.05k £130.05k £119.26k
Total expenditure £146.41k £146.41k £125.04k £125.04k £101.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A