THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, MARGARET STREET, LONDON W1

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object is the promotion of the Gospel of Our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctirnes and practices of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,921 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS, MARGARET STREET PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Benedict Anthony | Chair | 30 May 2021 |
|
|||||
John Mark Fleming | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keir John Martland | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Parker | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Mason | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamond Susan Clayton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rainey KC | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Agustin Remotti-Breton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Alan Howard Rimmer | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Joseph Fielden | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirill Dashkovskiy | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Everton | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Foss | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huw Pryce | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LYDIA HODGETTS | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JANET DRAKE | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian Browning | Trustee | 05 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Christine Mather | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
AIDEN HARGREAVES-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Patrick Hartley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FORDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £518.55k | £392.46k | £408.78k | £494.47k | £443.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £515.10k | £402.20k | £408.03k | £496.44k | £469.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.92k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £409.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £91.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £46.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £512.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £11.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS VICARAGE
7 MARGARET STREET
LONDON
W1W 8JG
- Phone:
- 02076361788
- Email:
- office@ASMS.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window