Financial history The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Peter's Littleover and Blagreaves

Charity Number: 1133061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £137.20k £155.10k £173.67k £215.85k £573.88k
Total expenditure £149.97k £129.95k £163.54k £187.70k £223.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.26k £1.31k N/A £500 £910
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £509.69k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.29k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.15k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.75k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £377.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £223.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.58k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0