Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY, BOURNE STREET, LONDON

Charity number: 1134828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Andrew Stephen Walker Chair 01 June 2017
THE HELENA AND KENNETH LEVY TRUST
Received: On time
PINE APPLE BOURNE STREET LIMITED
Received: 24 days late
DAVID LAWRENCE MARCHESE Trustee 28 April 2024
PINE APPLE BOURNE STREET LIMITED
Received: 24 days late
ST MARY'S TRUST
Received: On time
Clive Maxwell Lawton Osborne Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Robert Weaver Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Vincent John Pilgrim Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Michelle Denise Gurney Trustee 23 April 2023
GRESHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
Zeb Micic Trustee 23 April 2023
THE SOCIETY FOR ARMY HISTORICAL RESEARCH
Received: On time
Mark Rhodes Trustee 08 May 2022
WILTONS MUSIC HALL
Received: On time
PINE APPLE BOURNE STREET LIMITED
Received: 24 days late
Catriona Jennet Edington Woollcombe Gambrill Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Jack Francis Moore Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Timothy David Jones Trustee 29 May 2021
None on record
Martin Gower Woolley Trustee 29 May 2021
THE HELENA AND KENNETH LEVY TRUST
Received: On time
Mhairi Ellis Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
David Robert Ernest Francis Parchot Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
David Crickmore Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Peter Michael Reed Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Rev Sam Christopher Korn Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Andrew William Nelson Probert Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
DAVID WESTLAKE RICHARDS Trustee
PINE APPLE BOURNE STREET LIMITED
Received: 24 days late
THE HELENA AND KENNETH LEVY TRUST
Received: On time
KRIS ROMANSKI Trustee
ST MARY'S TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, PIMLICO, LONDON
Received: On time
KATE COSTELOE Trustee
None on record