Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, BLANDFORD FORUM

Charity Number: 1132519
Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £143.72k £108.19k £226.51k £945.31k £735.35k
Total expenditure £136.10k £104.10k £74.21k £1.02m £475.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £42.90k N/A £166.20k £629.86k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £291.66k £719.21k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £50 £12.32k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £23.68k £2.57k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £63 £548
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £629.86k £706
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £110.79k £47.86k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.02m £432.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £43.00k