CHELSEA, HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of buildings for worship. Provides a structure to enable churches in the circuit to carry out their mission. Trains local preachers and lay leaders. Promotes Christian faith through Circuit services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Faith Mwari Nyota | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Alvin Roncal | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
James Thomas Goode | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Esther Olawunmi Fatogun | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Julie Carole Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Tamby Rajah | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nigel Timothy Cowgill | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Colmeta Arletta Thorpe | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Gertie Barker | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Ayodeji Emmanuel Okegbile | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Iesinga Vunipola | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ALBERT ADRIAN MONTAGUE GRIGG | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
ALAN FREDERICK MILLS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Thomas Lawrence | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JANE KESSIWAH-BOBIE BA BUS COM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN CORTON B.SC, M.ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EUNICE MENSAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Olateju Ayoola Fatogun MBA BUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.91k | £300.64k | £1.02m | £370.77k | £308.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.51k | £269.66k | £268.88k | £336.40k | £408.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £22.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £127.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £145.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £14.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £225.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £43.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £5.91k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £275 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
01 September 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 April 2022 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
16 April 2022 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 July 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 July 2020 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
155a Kings Road
Chelsea
London
- Phone:
- 02073529305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window