ST THOMAS METHODIST CHURCH, EXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides religious worship and teaching open to all. The Church seeks to care for both those within its membership and the wider community and to serve the community in which it is set.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Donna Alice Leigh | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Crawford Taylor Munro | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Daliah June Ley | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Prouse | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER STUART GOODWIN | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esther Reed | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine James | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hunkin | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Shute | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bolton | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bews | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Scott | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David House | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRADFORD | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|||||
David Kirk | Trustee | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET LEE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER CHARLES BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.68k | £169.31k | £65.51k | £70.96k | £60.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.28k | £163.10k | £65.92k | £58.48k | £60.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas Methodist Church
110-111 Cowick Street
EXETER
EX4 1JE
- Phone:
- 01392255791
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window