Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CONISBROUGH

Charity number: 1134036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £73.93k £96.43k £113.99k £96.43k £92.34k
Total expenditure £73.83k £84.91k £137.57k £97.34k £104.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A N/A N/A N/A