THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CULLOMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION IS TO "REVEAL THE HEART OF JESUS IN THE HEART OF OUR COMMUNITY". THE CORE PARISH HAS A POPULATION OVER 10,000 AND THIS IS SET TO DOUBLE IN THE NEXT 15 YEARS. THE CHURCH IS LOOKING AT NEW EXPRESSIONS OF "DOING CHURCH" WITHOUT REFERENCE TO THE MAIN CHURCH BUILDING AND IS SEEKING TO PLANT CHURCH COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE WIDER CULM VALLEY AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,700 from 3 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
181 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREWS CHURCH, CULLOMPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trudy Miller | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dorcas Moore | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Handford | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lawton | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Buzzacott | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mary Deare | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Wilson | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James William Bryant | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Adam Michael Brooks | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Charles Cornish | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Cozens | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katrina Stuchbery | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Foster | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith David Rushforth | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ed Hobbs | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.38k | £335.73k | £287.02k | £304.28k | £330.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.16k | £267.14k | £321.24k | £329.89k | £341.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.39k | £9.73k | N/A | £6.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Andrew's Church Office
c/o Cullompton Community Centre
1 Pye Corner
Cullompton
Devon
EX15 1JX
- Phone:
- 0188433249
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window