Financial history MILTON KEYNES METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1137998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £225.93k £240.40k £253.02k £253.73k £270.05k
Total expenditure £249.08k £249.98k £240.04k £255.22k £285.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A