Trustees MILTON KEYNES METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

39 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tendayi Pearce Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Commey Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
Yvonne Valerie Swannell Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
John Terence Careford Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Richard Antwi-Gyamfi Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Rev Edson Dube Trustee 01 September 2020
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MILTON KEYNES TRUST
Received: On time
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Celia Ann Foster Trustee 07 February 2020
None on record
David Ronald Jones Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
David Arthur Sweetnam Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Lynne Denise Smith Trustee 01 April 2019
WATLING VALLEY ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: 116 days late
Berlinda Boachie Tawiah Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Carl Anthony Pinnock Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Daniel Joseph Mahon Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Ann Beverley Beaton Trustee 28 January 2019
None on record
Pamela Margaret Harvey Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Peter John Galsworthy Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Batten Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Deacon Stephen John Peck Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Adrian Schofield Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Richard Okane Adjei Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record